+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Huggins
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 30, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 18
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor