+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Act No. 144
- Effective date See Act for Effective Date
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 158
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Read second time
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin , Hutto, Campsen, Matthews, Talley
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (3)
April 20, 2022: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 2
April 6, 2022: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 4
April 6, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor