+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Hembree , Allen, Thurmond
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thursday, January 16, 2014
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Continued
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 6-613
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Loftis
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Putnam
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Taylor
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
January 16, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 19
- Absent: 5