+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin , Hembree, Johnson
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Edge, Loftis
- Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Owens, GM Smith, Whitmire, Hiott, Forrester, JR Smith, Barfield, Ryhal, Anderson, Clemmons, Goldfinch, Loftis, Bedingfield, GR Smith, Hardee, Gagnon, JE Smith
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Bales, Weeks
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Toole
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Ballentine, Forrester, Sottile, Lowe
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss, Erickson, Herbkersman
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Atwater, H.L.Ott
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Clemmons
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
March 20, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor