+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act No. 69
- Effective date 05/17/21
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 85
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Finance
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Wheeler, Henderson-Myers
- Read second time
- Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Weeks
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Wetmore
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: J.Moore, Henegan
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Pendarvis
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
May 6, 2021: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 1
April 6, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor