+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act No. 14
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 03/28/19
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 23
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Amended
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture and Natural Resources
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Introduced and read first time
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Johnson, Hardee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-21-19
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Member request name added as sponsor: Magnuson, Hill
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Atkinson, Ligon
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley, Mace
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: B.Newton
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Kirby, Forrest, Young, Hixon
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2019: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 6
February 21, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 19
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor