+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act No. 42
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 07/01/15
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
- Ratified R 31
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-2
- Read second time
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
- Introduced and read first time
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
April 22, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 2
March 24, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor