+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Act No. 171
- Effective date 09/29/20
On September 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On September 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 172
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On September 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On September 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Weeks
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: R.Williams
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (3)
September 22, 2020: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 106
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 3
September 15, 2020: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
April 9, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 4