+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: Anderson, Rivers, S.Williams
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Erickson
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Caskey
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On December 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
April 20, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor