+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Govan, Williams
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Thayer
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
April 6, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 4