+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act No. 236
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 05/17/18
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 234
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-2
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Withdrawn
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-79 Nays-28
- Read second time
- Requests for debate-Rep. Toole
- Amended
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor