+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act No. 41
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date See Act for Effective Date
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
- Ratified R 28
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
- Free conference report received and adopted
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Free conference committee appointed Campsen, Coleman, and S. Martin
- Free conference powers granted
- Free conference report adopted
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-1
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Free conference committee appointed Pits, Ott, Hixon
- Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0
- Free conference powers granted
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Campsen, Coleman, and S. Martin
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Pitts, Ott, and Hixon
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-0 Nays-42
- Non-concurrence in House amendment
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with amendments
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Amended
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-1
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry
- Polled out of committee Fish, Game and Forestry
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
- Introduced and read first time
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: White
- Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-1
- Amended
- Read second time
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On December 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (9)
April 15, 2015: Adopt Free Conference Report
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 2
March 26, 2015: To adopt the free conference report
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 25, 2015: Granting Free Conference Powers
- Yeas: 107
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 7
March 5, 2015: To concur
- Nays: 42
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2015: Adopt Amendment number 1a
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2015: Table Amendment number 1a
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 103
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 3
February 19, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 3, 2015: Table Amendment number 2
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 2
February 3, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor