+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 134
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date See Act For Effective Date
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 146
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Daning
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On December 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2014: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 6
February 25, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
June 4, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 19
- Absent: 3