+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act No. 8
- Effective date 04/02/15
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 18
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
- Introduced and read first time
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, Gilliard, Erickson, Riley
- Roll call Yeas-118 Nays-0
- Amended
- Read second time
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Member request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss, Dillard, Knight
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Burns, Chumley, Kirby, Hixon, Toole, Corley, Gagnon, Duckworth, Hardee, Johnson, Clemmons, Douglas, Ballentine, Tallon, Hodges, Henegan, Hiott
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On December 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 8
February 3, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 118
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor