+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-23
- Read second time
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Putnam, Bedingfield, Loftis, Stringer, Forrester, Erickson, Gambrell, Gagnon, Thayer, Sandifer
- Member request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, Williams, Hosey, Gilliard
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: M.S.McLeod
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
On December 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
May 15, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 5