+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act No. 34
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 05/13/19
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 47
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 4
March 5, 2019: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor