+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
February 19, 2019: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor