+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act No. 2
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 02/21/19
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 3
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Requests for debate-Rep. King, McDaniel, S. Williams
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-7-19
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Education
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
February 7, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 20
- Absent: 3
January 29, 2019: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor