+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Act No. 168
- Effective date 05/16/22
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 168
On May 6, 2022 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-5-22
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Family and Veterans' Services
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
- Introduced and read first time
On December 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2022: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 4
February 11, 2021: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5