+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy , McLeod, Senn, Adams, Garrett
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor