+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act No. 92
- Effective date 06/24/21
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 112
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-0
- Read second time
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Delegation report: Favorable Spartanburg Delegation
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Spartanburg Delegation
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
June 9, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 6
April 7, 2021: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor