+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act No. 197
- Effective date See Act for Effective Date
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 211
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-114 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture and Natural Resources
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Introduced and read first time
On December 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 2
April 21, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor