+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 304
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 05/16/14
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 186
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-73 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Read second time
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
+ − Vote
May 14, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 46
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor