+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Judiciary
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Gregory , Rankin, Johnson
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time