+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 9, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor