+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Act No. 169
- Effective date 09/30/20
On September 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On September 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 166
On September 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-30 Nays-4
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On September 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-76 Nays-13
- Read second time
- Amended
- Requests for debate-Rep. Hiott, GR Smith, Trantham, Stringer, Haddon, Burns, Magnuson, Morgan, Martin, Oremus, Blackwell, Taylor, Hixon, Daning, Long, Forrest, Bennett, Jefferson, McCravy, Rose, Caskey, Ott, VS Moss, King, S. Williams, Rivers, Brawley, and Anderson
On September 15, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Turner , Hutto, Talley, Cash, Harpootlian
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (4)
September 23, 2020: To concur
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 9
September 22, 2020: Table Amendment 1 Amendment number 1
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 83
- Present/NV: 24
- Absent: 4
September 22, 2020: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 30
- Absent: 4
May 12, 2020: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor