+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Recommitted to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Recommitted to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-34 Nays-4
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 16, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 5