+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Orangeburg Delegation
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Orangeburg Delegation
- Introduced
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted, sent to House
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor