+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Transportation
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor