+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Transportation
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced