+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
On December 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Prefiled