+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted, sent to House
- Recalled from Committee on Transportation
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor