+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Committee on Education
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-93
- Senate amendment amended
- Reconsidered
- Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-93
- Non-concurrence in Senate amendment
- Returned to Senate with amendments
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-22-15
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-21-15
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reconsidered
- Roll call Yeas-72 Nays-2
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Read second time
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Education
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-72 Nays-1
- Read second time
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (5)
April 23, 2015: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Nays: 93
- Present/NV: 25
- Absent: 6
April 23, 2015: Adopt Amendment number 1a
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 19
- Absent: 6
April 15, 2015: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 47
- Absent: 2
April 1, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
March 24, 2015: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 46
- Absent: 4