+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Introduced
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor