+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 13, 2013 in the House:
- Act No. 114
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 04/15/13
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified R 32
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled for ratification
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
- Conference report received and adopted
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Conference report adopted
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Matthews, Hayes, and S.Martin
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Bingham, Allison, Hayes
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Non-concurrence in House amendment
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Senate amendment amended
- Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-1
- Returned to Senate with amendments
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: Atwater
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (5)
April 24, 2013: To adopt the conference report
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
April 24, 2013: Adopt conference report
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 18
- Absent: 5
March 19, 2013: Adopt Amendment number 1
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 5
March 6, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
February 5, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 27
- Absent: 5