+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 17, 2015 in the House:
- Act No. 127
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 05/07/15
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
- Ratified R 30
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable General
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on General
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-3
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: W.J.McLeod, Gilliard
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Amended
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Member request name added as sponsor: Hardee, Clemmons, Goldfinch, Hardwick, Johnson, Duckworth
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Yow
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
March 4, 2015: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 19
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor