+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committed to Committee on Judiciary
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 1-24-13
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 1-21-13
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
On December 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
January 24, 2013: Commit to judiciary
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor