+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 8, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 302
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 06/06/14
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 290
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-64 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Read second time
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
+ − Vote
June 4, 2014: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 64
- Present/NV: 55
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor