+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Adopted, sent to House
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Transportation
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor