+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 8, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 314
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 05/16/14
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 184
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Education
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2014: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 108
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 5
April 15, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor