+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Vote
March 29, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor