+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Adopted, sent to House
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Transportation
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor