+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 13, 2013 in the House:
- Act No. 109
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 06/11/13
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Became law without Governor's signature
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified R 64
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Debate adjourned
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-1
- Read second time
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 107
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 4
May 7, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3