+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-82 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Recalled from Beaufort Delegation
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Beaufort Delegation
- Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
March 26, 2015: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 82
- Present/NV: 35
- Absent: 6