+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 17, 2015 in the House:
- Act No. 115
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 06/03/15
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Became law without Governor's signature
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified R 67
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (2)
May 12, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2015: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 25
- Absent: 4