+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (42)
On August 17, 2015 in the House:
- Act No. 93
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date See Act for Effective Date
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Veto overridden on certain items: 1-3
On July 7, 2015 in the House:
- Veto overridden on certain items: 1-3
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Certain items vetoed by Governor
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference report adopted
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-1
- Conference report adopted
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-1
- Ordered enrolled for ratification
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified R 128
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Leatherman, Setzler, Peeler
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. White, Pitts, Clyburn
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-1 Nays-34
- Non-concurrence in House amendment
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Amended
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-5
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Debate interrupted
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Debate interrupted
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Debate interrupted
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Debate interrupted
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Debate interrupted
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Debate interrupted
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Debate interrupted
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-27 Nays-17
- Debate interrupted
- Amended
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Finance
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Special order, set for Immediately following second reading of H.3701
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (16)
July 7, 2015: To override the veto 3
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 5
July 7, 2015: Override VETO 2
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
July 7, 2015: Override VETO 3
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
July 7, 2015: Override VETO 1
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 8
July 7, 2015: To override the veto 1
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
July 7, 2015: To override the veto 2
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
June 23, 2015: Adoption of Conference Report
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 5
June 23, 2015: To adopt the conference report
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
June 17, 2015: To concur
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 34
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 3
June 17, 2015: Adopt Amendment
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 18
- Absent: 13
June 16, 2015: To lay on the table Amendment number 5A
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
June 16, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
May 20, 2015: Rule 15A-Cloture
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 2
May 13, 2015: To adjourn debate
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
May 12, 2015: Overrule the ruling of the President
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2015: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 8