+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Transportation
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 13, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 4