+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Committed to Committee on Judiciary
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Recommitted to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced and read first time
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On December 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
March 12, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor