+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 8, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 317
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 05/22/14
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Became law without Governor's signature
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 185
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2014: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 5
April 8, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 3