+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 8, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 316
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 03/13/14
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 144
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2014: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 3
February 6, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1